US SB4957 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for an emergency increase in Federal funding to State Medicaid programs for expenditures on home and community-based services.
Title
COVID HCBS Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8871 (Same As) 2020-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8871 (Same As) 2020-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Allied health services
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Mental health
Nursing
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Mental health
Nursing
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4957/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4957/BILLS-116s4957is.pdf |