US SB489 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows residents who are not already eligible for Medicaid and not concurrently enrolled in other health insurance coverage to buy into a state Medicaid plan beginning January 1, 2020, at the option of the state. State Medicaid programs may set premiums and cost-sharing requirements for such coverage in accordance with specified limitations. The bill also (1) provides the enhanced Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (FMAP) to every state that expands Medicaid coverage for individuals who are newly eligible under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, regardless of when such expansion takes place; and (2) requires state Medicaid programs to cover comprehensive reproductive health care services, including abortion services.
Title
State Public Option Act
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB584 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1277 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB585 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1277 (Same As) 2019-12-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB585 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Abortion
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
Sex and reproductive health
State and local government operations
Women's health
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Income tax credits
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
Sex and reproductive health
State and local government operations
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/489/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s489/BILLS-116s489is.pdf |