US SB48 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title V of the Social Security Act to establish a grant program for community-based maternal mentoring programs.
Title
Community Mentors for Moms Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB74 (Related) 2023-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB477 (Related) 2023-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4789 (Related) 2023-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
HB477 (Related) 2023-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4789 (Related) 2023-08-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Foreign Agriculture, and Horticulture.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-bill/48/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/s48/BILLS-118s48is.pdf |