US SB471 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Star Print ordered on the reported bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to allow Members of Congress to opt out of the Federal Employees Retirement System, and allow Members who opt out of the Federal Employees Retirement System to continue to participate in the Thrift Savings Plan.
Title
Members of Congress Pension Opt Out Clarification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the reported bill. |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 481. |
2022-09-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper for Senator Peters with amendments. With written report No. 117-143. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB470 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1359 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1359 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.