US SB4657 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to designate one week each year as "Buddy Check Week" for the purpose of outreach and education concerning peer wellness checks for veterans, and for other purposes. This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to designate one week each year as Buddy Check Week for the purposes of organizing outreach events and educating veterans on how to conduct peer wellness checks. The VA shall ensure that the Veterans Crisis Line has a plan for handling the potential increase in calls that may occur during such week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to designate one week each year as "Buddy Check Week" for the purpose of outreach and education concerning peer wellness checks for veterans, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB2898 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4290 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB785 (Related) 2020-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 116-171. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback