US SB4627 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the federal cost share of certain emergency assistance relating to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, the bill provides for (1) a 100% federal cost share of assistance provided under the emergency declaration issued by the President on March 13, 2020, relating to COVID-19 and any subsequent major disaster declaration that supersedes it; and (2) at least a 90% federal cost share of assistance provided for any emergency or major disaster declared by the President from January 1-December 31, 2020. With respect to the emergency declaration issued on March 13, 2020, the President may provide assistance for activities, costs, and purchases of states or local governments or the owners or operators of eligible private nonprofits, including, among other things backfill costs for first responders and other essential employees who are ill or quarantined; increased operating costs for essential government services due to such emergency; costs associated with maintaining alternate care facilities or related facilities currently inactive but related to future needs tied to the ongoing pandemic event; personal protective equipment and other critical supplies and services for first responders and other essential employees; and costs of procuring and distributing food to individuals affected by the pandemic through networks established by state, local, or tribal governments or other organizations.
Title
FEMA Assistance Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6669 (Related) 2020-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8266 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
HB6669 (Related) 2020-05-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8266 (Same As) 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4627/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4627/BILLS-116s4627is.pdf |