US SB4554 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S4529)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-11 - Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S4529)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to express support for protecting access to reproductive health care after the Dobbs v. Jackson decision on June 24, 2022.
Title
Reproductive Freedom for Women Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-10 - Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed S. 4554 RC# 211 (Y: 49 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-11 | Senate | Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (CR S4529) |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Motion by Senator Schumer to reconsider the vote by which cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure was not invoked (Record Vote No. 211) made in Senate. |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 44. Record Vote Number: 211. |
2024-07-10 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure in Senate. (consideration: CR S4328-4334) |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure presented in Senate. (CR S4224) |
2024-07-08 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S4224) |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 420. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |