US SB4488 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 638.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish an interagency committee on global catastrophic risk, and for other purposes.
Title
Global Catastrophic Risk Management Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 638. |
2022-12-13 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-254. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB4521 (Related) 2022-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8574 (Same As) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB8574 (Same As) 2022-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.