US SB4472 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Secure and Trusted Communications Network Reimbursement Program to include eligible telecommunications carriers and providers of educational broadband service, and for other purposes.
Title
Ensuring Network Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 640. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8000 (Same As) 2020-08-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.