US SB441 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-11 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-427.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Organ Mountains-Desert Peaks Conservation Act This bill designates specified lands in New Mexico administered by the Bureau of Land Management (BLM) of the Department of the Interior as wilderness and as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System. Such wilderness areas shall also be administered as components of the National Landscape Conservation System. The bill designates approximately 100 acres of specified BLM land in New Mexico as a potential wilderness area, upon which Interior shall permit only those uses already permitted. When specified conditions have been met, this area shall be incorporated into the Robledo Mountains Wilderness. The bill releases from further review for designation as wilderness the public land in Dona Ana County, New Mexico, administered by the BLM and not designated as wilderness. The bill withdraws the Potrillo Mountains Complex from the Potrillo Mountains Wilderness and closes a specified route from public access, making it available only for administrative and law enforcement uses, including border security. In implementing a management plan for the Organ Mountains-Desert Peaks National Monument in New Mexico, Interior shall include a watershed health assessment to identify opportunities for watershed restoration. Any land or interest that is within specified state trust land acquired by the United States shall become part of the monument. Interior shall convey to the state of New Mexico specified BLM land in exchange for specified parcels of state trust land within the monument.
Title
Organ Mountains-Desert Peaks Conservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-427. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 719. |
2018-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2354 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Historical and cultural resources
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Monuments and memorials
New Mexico
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Water quality
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats