US SB2354 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ANTIQUITIES Act of 2018 America's Natural Treasures of Immeasurable Quality Unite, Inspire, and Together Improve the Economies of States Act of 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANTIQUITIES Act of 2018 America's Natural Treasures of Immeasurable Quality Unite, Inspire, and Together Improve the Economies of States Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB5600 (Related) 2018-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB432 (Related) 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB441 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held.
HB6410 (Same As) 2018-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback