US SB432 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cerros del Norte Conservation Act (Sec. 3) This bill designates the Cerro del Yuta Wilderness (comprising approximately 13,420 acres) and Rio San Antonio Wilderness (comprising approximately 8,120 acres) within the Rio Grande del Norte National Monument in New Mexico as wilderness and as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System. The bill sets forth requirements for the management of the wilderness areas regarding: (1) livestock grazing, (2) the creation of protective perimeters and buffer zones, and (3) the jurisdiction of the state of New Mexico respecting fish and wildlife located on public land in New Mexico. The bill releases specified public land within the San Antonio Wilderness Study Area not designated as wilderness by this bill from further study for such a designation. The bill requires the wilderness areas to be administered as components of the National Landscape Conservation System. The bill withdraws any federal land within the wilderness areas, including any acquired land or interest, from: (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) operation of the mineral leasing, mineral materials, and geothermal leasing laws. The bill declares that nothing in this bill enlarges, diminishes, or otherwise modifies any treaty rights.
Title
Cerros del Norte Conservation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-12-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-12-22 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S8267-8269; text: CR S8269) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 54. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-40. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5600 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SB2354 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2354 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
New Mexico
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats