US SB4254 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-30 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Lobbying Disclosure Act of 1995 to clarify a provision relating to certain contents of registrations under that Act.
Title
Disclosing Foreign Influence in Lobbying Act
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-30 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-30 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6049-6050; text: CR S6050) |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 491. |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-150. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB8246 (Same As) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.