US SB4243 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Department of Homeland Security Trade and Economic Security Council and the position of Assistant Secretary for Trade and Economic Security within the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Title
DHS Trade and Economic Security Council Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 560. |
2022-11-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 117-208. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4476 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.
HB7776 (Related) 2022-12-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-263.