US SB419 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide for a full annuity supplement for certain air traffic controllers.
Title
CONTRACT Act of 2021 Continuity for Operators with Necessary Training Required for ATC Contract Towers Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651. |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters without amendment. With written report No. 117-260. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1283 (Same As) 2022-11-17 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.