US SB4166 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize preparedness programs to support communities containing technological hazards and emerging threats.
Title
Technological Hazards Preparedness and Training Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-09-29 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-09-29 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-09-28 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5162-5163; text: CR S5163) |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 440. |
2022-07-12 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with amendments. With written report No. 117-129. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |