US SB4104 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-349.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to approve the settlement of water rights claims of the Hualapai Tribe and certain allottees in the State of Arizona, to authorize construction of a water project relating to those water rights claims, and for other purposes.
Title
Hualapai Tribe Water Rights Settlement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 360 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-349. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 360 - 55 (Roll no. 542). (text: 12/21/2022 CR H9942-9952) |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10033-10034) |
2022-12-22 | House | By Senator Schatz from Committee on Indian Affairs filed written report. Report No. 117-287. |
2022-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 4104. |
2022-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9942-9952) |
2022-12-21 | House | Mrs. Peltola moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7315-7325) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6547 Amendment SA 6547 proposed by Senator Schatz. (consideration: CR S7302; text: CR S7315-7325) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | S.Amdt.6547 Amendment SA 6547 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | The committee amendments withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S7302) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7292-7302) |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 684. |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz with amendments. Without written report. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-07-20 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7633 (Same As) 2022-05-12 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.
HB5118 (Related) 2022-08-02 - Received in the Senate.