US SB4096 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program through July 27, 2023.
Title
A bill to extend the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB3506 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3506 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4096/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4096/BILLS-116s4096is.pdf |