US SB4080 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 622.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 622.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to modify the boundary of the Berryessa Snow Mountain National Monument to include certain Federal land in Lake County, California, and for other purposes.
Title
Berryessa Snow Mountain National Monument Expansion Act
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 622. |
2022-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin without amendment. With written report No. 117-245. |
2022-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2132-2133) |
Same As/Similar To
HB6366 (Related) 2022-03-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.