US SB3903 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-04 - Became Public Law No: 111-381.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits land held in trust for the Ohkay Owingeh Pueblo (New Mexico) to be leased for a term of up to 99 years.
Title
A bill to authorize leases of up to 99 years for lands held in trust for Ohkay Owingeh Pueblo.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-04 | Became Public Law No: 111-381. | |
2011-01-04 | Signed by President. | |
2010-12-28 | Presented to President. | |
2010-12-22 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-12-22 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-22 | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H8980) | |
2010-12-22 | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H8980) | |
2010-12-22 | Mr. Lujan asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. | |
2010-12-22 | Held at the desk. | |
2010-12-22 | Received in the House. | |
2010-12-22 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-12-21 | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10934; text as passed Senate: CR S10934) | |
2010-12-16 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 701. | |
2010-12-16 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Dorgan with amendments. With written report No. 111-371. | |
2010-11-18 | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | |
2010-09-29 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4276 (Same As) 2009-12-10 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.