US SB3868 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Defense and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to ensure that the first health assessment conducted for a member of the Armed Forces or veteran after such an individual tests positive for a virus certified as a pandemic includes an evaluation of whether the individual has been (1) based or stationed at a location where an open burn pit was used, or (2) exposed to toxic airborne chemicals or contaminants relating to service in the Armed Forces. A burn pit is an area used for burning solid waste in open air without equipment. If such an evaluation establishes that an individual was based or stationed at a location where an open burn pit was used, or that the individual was exposed to toxic airborne chemicals or contaminants, the individual must be enrolled in the Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry unless they opt out of enrollment. The VA's Airborne Hazards and Burn Pits Center of Excellence must conduct a study on the health impacts of infection with a virus designated as a global pandemic, including the coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19), to members of the Armed Forces and veterans who have been exposed to open burn pits and other toxic exposures. The study must be analyzed to assist in preparation for potential future pandemics.
Title
Pandemic Care for Burn Pits Exposure Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7684 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7684 (Same As) 2020-09-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Conflicts and wars
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Iraq
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Middle East
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Conflicts and wars
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fires
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Iraq
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Middle East
Military medicine
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Solid waste and recycling
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3868/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3868/BILLS-116s3868is.pdf |