US SB3858 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-16 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish within the Office of Land and Emergency Management of the Environmental Protection Agency the Office of Mountains, Deserts, and Plains, and for other purposes.
Title
Legacy Mine Cleanup Act of 2024
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-04-16 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 344. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Carper with amendments. Without written report. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB10023 (Related) 2024-10-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.