US SB384 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-20 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Springfield 1908 Race Riot National Monument in the State of Illinois, and for other purposes.
Title
Springfield 1908 Race Riot National Monument Act
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 294. |
2023-12-20 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Manchin with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-142. |
2023-09-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |