US SB383 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a specified segment of the Illabot Creek in Skagit County, Washington, as a component of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Title
A bill to amend the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate a segment of Illabot Creek in Skagit County, Washington, as a component of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Held at the desk. |
2013-06-20 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-20 | House | Received in the House. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4721) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 61. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-30. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB829 (Same As) 2013-05-17 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 50.
Subjects
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Washington State
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats