US SB382 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-9-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter Cancer Registry Act of 2018 This bill requires the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop and maintain a voluntary registry of firefighters to collect history and occupational information that can be linked to existing data in state cancer registries. The registry must be used to improve monitoring of cancer among firefighters and to collect and publish epidemiological information regarding cancer among firefighters. The CDC should seek to include specified information in the registry, including the number and type of fire incidents attended by an individual. To collect information for the registry, the CDC may incorporate questions into existing public health surveys, questionnaires, and other databases. The CDC must: (1) develop a strategy to maximize participation in the registry; (2) develop guidance for states and firefighting agencies regarding the registry; (3) encourage inclusion in the registry of data on minority, female, and volunteer firefighters; and (4) seek feedback on the registry from nonfederal experts. The CDC must develop a process for making registry data available for research without a fee if findings or publications from the research are made public or available to stakeholders.
Title
Firefighter Cancer Registry Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB931 (Same As) 2018-07-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-194.
Subjects
Cancer
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
Personnel records
State and local government operations
Women's health
Worker safety and health
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government information and archives
Health
Health information and medical records
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
Personnel records
State and local government operations
Women's health
Worker safety and health