US HB931 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 114-75)
Status: Passed on July 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-07 - Became Public Law No: 115-194.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firefighter Cancer Registry Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) to develop and maintain a voluntary registry of firefighters in order to collect history and occupational information that can be used to determine the incidence of cancer among firefighters. The registry must be used to improve monitoring of cancer among firefighters and to collect and publish epidemiological information. The CDC should seek to include specified information in the registry, including the number and type of fire incidents attended by an individual. To collect information for the registry, the CDC must enable the registry to connect to state-based cancer registries. The CDC must also: (1) develop a strategy to encourage participation in the registry, (2) develop guidance for states and firefighting agencies regarding the registry, and (3) seek feedback on the registry from nonfederal experts. The CDC must make registry data available to the public and in accordance with privacy laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighter Cancer Registry Act of 2017

Sponsors

Rep. Chris Collins [R]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D]Rep. Mark Amodei [R]Rep. Lou Barletta [R]
Rep. Garland Barr [R]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D]Rep. Mike Bost [R]
Rep. Susan Brooks [R]Rep. Julia Brownley [D]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D]Rep. Barbara Comstock [R]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D]Rep. Diana DeGette [D]Rep. Daniel Donovan [R]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D]Rep. Eliot Engel [D]Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D]Rep. Bill Foster [D]
Rep. John Faso [R]Rep. John Garamendi [D]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D]Rep. Denny Heck [D]
Rep. David Joyce [R]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D]Rep. John Katko [R]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D]
Rep. Ron Kind [D]Rep. Peter King [R]Rep. Stephen Knight [R]Rep. Ann Kuster [D]
Rep. Sander Levin [D]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R]Rep. David Loebsack [D]
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D]Rep. Betty McCollum [D]Rep. James McGovern [D]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D]Rep. Richard Nolan [D]Rep. Donald Norcross [D]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D]Rep. Donald Payne [D]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D]Rep. Collin Peterson [D]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D]Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R]Rep. James Renacci [R]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D]
Rep. Harold Rogers [R]Rep. Tim Ryan [D]Rep. Jose Serrano [D]Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D]
Rep. Bill Shuster [R]Rep. Krysten Sinema [D]Rep. Albio Sires [D]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D]
Rep. Christopher Smith [R]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D]Rep. Claudia Tenney [R]Rep. Paul Tonko [D]
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D]Rep. David Valadao [R]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R]Rep. Timothy Walz [D]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D]Rep. John Yarmuth [D]Rep. Don Young [R]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R]Rep. Leonard Lance [R]Rep. Adam Smith [D]Rep. Sean Maloney [D]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R]Rep. Tom Reed [R]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D]Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R]Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R]Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R]
Rep. James Langevin [D]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D]Rep. Robert Scott [D]Rep. Ryan Costello [R]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D]Rep. Tim Murphy [R]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D]Rep. Walter Jones [R]Rep. David Young [R]Rep. Mike Kelly [R]
Rep. Jackie Speier [D]Rep. Jacky Rosen [D]Rep. David McKinley [R]Rep. Anthony Brown [D]
Rep. Robert Wittman [R]Rep. Michael Turner [R]Rep. Chris Stewart [R]Rep. Steny Hoyer [D]
Rep. David Cicilline [D]Rep. Gene Green [D]Rep. Roger Marshall [R]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D]Rep. Val Demings [D]Rep. Mark Takano [D]Rep. Scott Taylor [R]
Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D]Rep. Mia Love [R]Rep. John Larson [D]
Rep. Rob Bishop [R]Rep. Lacy Clay [D]Rep. David Reichert [R]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R]Rep. Steve Stivers [R]Rep. Robert Brady [D]
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D]Rep. James Comer [R]Rep. Thomas Garrett [R]Rep. John Sarbanes [D]
Rep. John Delaney [D]Rep. Sam Graves [R]Rep. Jared Huffman [D]Rep. Andre Carson [D]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D]Rep. Michael Capuano [D]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R]Rep. John Conyers [D]
Rep. Evan Jenkins [R]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D]Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D]Rep. Donald McEachin [D]
Rep. Scott Peters [D]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D]Rep. Robert Latta [R]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R]Rep. Doris Matsui [D]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D]Rep. Richard Hudson [R]
Rep. Charles Dent [R]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D]
Rep. Martha McSally [R]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R]Rep. Darren Soto [D]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D]Rep. Al Lawson [D]Rep. Fred Upton [R]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R]Rep. Peter Visclosky [D]Rep. Bill Johnson [R]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D]
Rep. Mike Coffman [R]Rep. Joe Courtney [D]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R]
Rep. Jared Polis [D]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D]Rep. Grace Meng [D]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R]
Rep. Lois Frankel [D]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D]Rep. Paul Gosar [R]Rep. Gwen Moore [D]
Rep. Pete Sessions [R]Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D]Rep. Ro Khanna [D]Rep. Darrell Issa [R]
Rep. Ted Poe [R]Rep. Luis Correa [D]Rep. William Keating [D]Rep. Tom Emmer [R]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D]Rep. Judy Chu [D]Rep. Ken Calvert [R]Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-07SenateBecame Public Law No: 115-194.
2018-07-07SenateSigned by President.
2018-06-27SenatePresented to President.
2018-06-22SenateMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-22SenateOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H5572)
2018-06-22SenateMr. Collins (NY) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5572-5573)
2018-05-14SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-05-14SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2018-05-10SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-10SenateS.Amdt.2242 Amendment SA 2242 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2018-05-10SenateS.Amdt.2242 Amendment SA 2242 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S2631-2632; text: CR S2631-2632) To require the Secretary of Health and Human Services to develop a voluntary registry to collect data on cancer incidence among firefighters.
2018-05-10SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2631-2632)
2018-05-10SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2017-09-13SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2017-09-12HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-09-12HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7248-7249)
2017-09-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 931.
2017-09-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7248-7251)
2017-09-12HouseMr. Walden moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-09-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215.
2017-09-08HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-301.
2017-07-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2017-07-27HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-06-29HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2017-06-29HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-02-10HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB382 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 386.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback