US SB380 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-08-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Thunder Bay National Marine Sanctuary and Underwater Preserve Boundary Modification Act - Expands, notwithstanding any provision of law or regulation, the boundaries of the Thunder Bay National Marine Sanctuary and Underwater Preserve in Lake Huron.
Title
Thunder Bay National Marine Sanctuary and Underwater Preserve Boundary Modification Act
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-04 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148. | |
2009-08-04 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Rockefeller with amendments. With written report No. 111-65. | |
2009-05-20 | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. | |
2009-02-04 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB905 (Related) 2009-09-30 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 169.
Subjects
Great Lakes
Historic sites and heritage areas
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Michigan
Parks, recreation areas, trails