US SB3773 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-346.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-346.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to authorize leases of up to 99 years for land held in trust for the Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation.
Title
A bill to authorize leases of up to 99 years for land held in trust for the Confederated Tribes of the Chehalis Reservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-22 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 377 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-346. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 42 (Roll no. 541). (text: 12/21/2022 CR H9941) |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10032-10033) |
2022-12-21 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-12-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3773. |
2022-12-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9941-9942) |
2022-12-21 | House | Mrs. Peltola moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7808; text: CR S7808) |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 591. |
2022-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-233. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-360. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6964 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 498.