US SB3746 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2455)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2455)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to include certain employment as a health care practitioner as eligible for public service loan forgiveness, and for other purposes.
Title
Stopping Doctor Shortages Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2455) |
Same As/Similar To
HB4607 (Related) 2019-10-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB4674 (Related) 2020-12-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 583.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Education
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Tax-exempt organizations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Tax-exempt organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/3746/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s3746/BILLS-116s3746is.pdf |