US SB3729 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-09 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relief for recipients of financial assistance awards for FY2019 and FY2020 from the Department of Transportation (DOT). The bill expands the period of availability during which grant recipients may spend funds awarded through the (1) motor carrier safety assistance program, (2) commercial motor vehicle operators grant program, and (3) commercial driver's license program implementation grant program. DOT may keep and redistribute funds that were not allocated for FY2019 or FY2020.
Title
Motor Carrier Safety Grant Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-09 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-09 | House | Held at the desk. |
2020-12-09 | House | Received in the House. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7285; text: CR S7285) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 587. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-294. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
State and local finance
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Vocational and technical education
Licensing and registrations
Motor carriers
State and local finance
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Vocational and technical education