US SB371 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Department of the Interior to take the approximately 55.3 acres of land of the Blackwater Trading Post in Pinal County, Arizona, into trust for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, if the community conveys to Interior all of its interest in the land. The land is made part of the community's reservation. Further, the bill prohibits gaming on the land taken into trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
2021-03-24SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-6.
2021-03-10SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2021-02-23SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB478 (Same As) 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 59.
HR380 (Similar To) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback