US HB478 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 59.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Department of the Interior to take the approximately 55.3 acres of land of the Blackwater Trading Post in Pinal County, Arizona, into trust for the benefit of the Gila River Indian Community, if the community conveys to Interior all of its interest in the land. The land is made part of the community's reservation. Further, the bill prohibits gaming on the land taken into trust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Blackwater Trading Post Land Transfer Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 59.
2021-05-12HousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2236)
2021-05-12HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 478 are considered vacated.
2021-05-12HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-05-12HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 478.
2021-05-12HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2220-2221)
2021-05-12HouseMr. Soto moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2021-01-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB371 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 22.
HR380 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback