US SB3648 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Held at the desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Post-Katrina Management Reform Act of 2006 to repeal certain obsolete requirements, and for other purposes.
Title
HELP Response and Recovery Act Helping Eliminate Limitations for Prompt Response and Recovery Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2024-03-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2478; text: CR S2478) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 348. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-161. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |