US SB3648 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hurricanes Florence and Michael and California Wildfire Tax Relief Act
Title
Hurricanes Florence and Michael and California Wildfire Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4397 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6854 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7166 (Related) 2018-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6854 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB7166 (Related) 2018-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3648/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3648/BILLS-115s3648is.pdf |