US HB4397 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-15 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
California Wildfire Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow various tax credits, deductions, and modifications to existing rules for individuals and businesses affected by wildfires in California. With respect to individuals and businesses in the affected areas, the bill: waives the 10% additional tax on early distributions from retirement plans for up to $100,000 in distributions made on or after October 8, 2017, and before January 1, 2019; permits individuals to recontribute funds to retirement plans if the funds were distributed for a home purchase in a wildfire disaster area that was cancelled on account of the wildfires; increases the limit and extends the repayment deadline for loans from retirement plans; allows an employee retention tax credit for a portion of the wages paid to an employee whose principal place of employment on specified dates was in a wildfire disaster zone; temporarily suspends the limitation on charitable contributions for relief efforts in the wildfire disaster areas; modifies the rules for the deduction for personal casualty losses, and allows taxpayers to use earned income from the immediately preceding year for the purpose of determining earned income for the earned income tax credit and the child tax credit. The bill is designated as an emergency requirement, which exempts the budgetary effects of the bill from certain budget enforcement rules, such as Pay-As-You-Go (PAYGO) rules.
Title
California Wildfire Disaster Tax Relief Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-11-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1892 (Related) 2018-02-09 - Became Public Law No: 115-123. (TXT | PDF)
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6854 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3648 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3823 (Related) 2017-09-29 - Became Public Law No: 115-63. (TXT | PDF)
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
SB1892 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6854 (Related) 2018-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3648 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
California
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Poverty and welfare assistance
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Employee benefits and pensions
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Poverty and welfare assistance
Tax treatment of families
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/4397/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr4397/BILLS-115hr4397ih.pdf |