US SB3643 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VA Mission Telehealth Clarification Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545.
2020-09-15SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report.
2020-08-05SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2020-05-07SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB3228 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
SB4049 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB7992 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback