US SB3561 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-448.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-448.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
National Guard and Reserve Entrepreneurship Support Act
Title
National Guard and Reserve Entrepreneurship Support Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-448. |
2018-12-10 | House | Held at the desk. |
2018-12-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7333-7334; text: CR S7334) |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 635. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Reported by Senator Risch with amendments. Without written report. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7199 (Same As) 2018-11-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.