US SB3533 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defend and Save Social Security Act of 2012 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to: (1) increase the normal retirement age by specified graduated stages to 67 by 2019 and to 70 after December 31, 2030, and the early retirement age to 63 by 2019 and to 64 after December 31, 2022; (2) revise requirements for computation of the age increase factor; and (3) modify the cost-of-living adjustment (COLA) to 1% below the general COLA.
Title
Defend and Save Social Security Act of 2012
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1213 (Related) 2011-06-22 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3987-3989)
SB804 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB804 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3533/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3533/BILLS-112s3533is.pdf |