US SB1213 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3987-3989)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-22 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3987-3989)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defend and Save Social Security Act - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act to: (1) increase the normal retirement age by specified graduated stages to 67 by 2019 and to 69 after December 31, 2026, and the early retirement age to 63 by 2019 and to 64 after December 31, 2022; (2) revise requirements for computation of the age increase factor; and (3) modify the cost-of-living adjustment (COLA) to 1% below the general COLA.
Title
Defend and Save Social Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. Jon Kyl [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-22 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3987-3989) |
2011-06-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3893-3894) |
Same As/Similar To
SB804 (Related) 2011-04-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3533 (Related) 2012-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3533 (Related) 2012-09-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1213/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1213/BILLS-112s1213is.pdf |