US SB3519 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-345.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 117-345.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the National Trails System Act to designate the Butterfield Overland National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Title
Butterfield Overland National Historic Trail Designation Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-345. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2022-12-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10010-10011) |
2022-12-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 3519. |
2022-12-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10010-10011) |
2022-12-22 | House | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2022-12-21 | House | Held at the desk. |
2022-12-21 | House | Received in the House. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S9614) |
2022-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.6586 Amendment SA 6586 proposed by Senator Heinrich for Senator Boozman. (consideration: CR S9614; text: CR S9614) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | S.Amdt.6586 Amendment SA 6586 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9614) |
2022-12-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |