US SB3513 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes, revises, and repeals specified paid sick time and paid leave programs, including programs addressing the public-health emergency related to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019). Specifically, the bill repeals divisions of the Family First Coronavirus Response Act that (1) expand emergency family and medical leave, (2) provide emergency paid sick leave, and (3) the establish payroll tax credits for such emergency paid leave.The bill requires employers to grant at least 1 hour of accrued paid sick time to each employee for every 30 hours worked, up to a minimum of 56 hours, or 7 days, for use under specified circumstances. Further, employees are immediately entitled to up to 14 days of additional paid sick time if a public-health emergency is declared. The bill also reimburses the employers of individuals who use accrued or additional sick time under these provisions.Additionally, the bill establishes a family and medical leave insurance benefit program to provide up to 60 days of partially-paid leave for qualifying circumstances including to care for a specified close relative with a serious health condition. The bill establishes a trust to pay benefits under the program, which is funded by an employer payroll tax and employee income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing Americans Insured Days of Leave Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1185 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
SB463 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6150 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3415 (Related) 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6442 (Same As) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Assault and harassment offenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Census and government statistics
Child care and development
Civil actions and liability
Congressional agencies
Congressional officers and employees
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Labor
Domestic violence and child abuse
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employee leave
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Employment taxes
Executive agency funding and structure
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Labor and employment
Labor-management relations
Library of Congress
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Sex offenses
Social Security Administration
Unemployment
Wages and earnings

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback