US SB3415 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the availability of paid sick time by requiring employers with at least one employee to provide a minimum amount of accrued paid sick time per work week and additional paid sick time in the event of a public-health emergency such as the coronavirus (i.e., the virus that causes COVID-19).Specifically, the bill requires employers to grant at least 1 hour of accrued paid sick time to each employee for every 30 hours worked, up to a minimum of 56 hours, or 7 days, of paid sick time per year. Accrued paid sick time may be used for, among other reasons, an absence from work that is taken (1) due to a medical condition or illness or for the diagnosis, care, or prevention thereof; (2) to care for a child, spouse, domestic partner, parent, or other close relative with a medical condition or illness, or for the diagnosis or prevention thereof; (3) during a public-health emergency when the employee's workplace has been closed or the employee has been exposed to a communicable disease and may pose a risk to others; or (4) to care for a child or close relative during such public-health emergency, if such relative has been exposed to a communicable disease or the child's school has been closed.Further, employees are immediately entitled to up to 14 days of additional paid sick time if a public-health emergency is declared. This additional paid sick time may be used during the public-health emergency for the same purposes as accrued paid sick time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Paid Sick Days for Public Health Emergencies and Personal and Family Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Same As/Similar To

HB1784 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6201 (Related) 2020-03-19 - Engrossment Correction
SB840 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6150 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, Oversight and Reform, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3513 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6442 (Related) 2020-04-03 - Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback