US SB349 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Special Needs Trust Fairness Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act with respect to the treatment of revocable trusts for the benefit of an individual for purposes of meeting income requirements for Medicaid coverage. Extends the supplemental needs trust exemption from treatment of a trust as resources available to the individual to supplemental needs trusts for Medicaid beneficiaries established by those beneficiaries.
Title
Special Needs Trust Fairness Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-09-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-09-10 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-09-10 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6539; text as passed Senate: CR S6539) |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178. |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Reported by Senator Hatch without amendment. With written report No. 114-99. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Committee on Finance. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB670 (Same As) 2016-09-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.