US SB3467 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to withhold United States contributions to the United Nations Relief and Works Agency for Palestine Refugees in the Near East (UNRWA), and for other purposes.
Title
UNRWA Accountability and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 247. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4721 (Same As) 2021-08-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific, Central Asia and Nonproliferation.
SB2479 (Same As) 2021-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB2479 (Same As) 2021-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/3467/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s3467/BILLS-117s3467pcs.pdf |