US SB3418 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: Senate Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act or BEST Practices Act - Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD), no later than: (1) October 1, 2014, to develop, test, and validate human-based training methods for training members of the Armed Forces in the treatment of combat injuries, with the goal of replacing live animal-based training methods; and (2) October 1, 2016, to use only use human-based training methods for such purposes. Prohibits the use of animals in such training after the latter date. Provides an exception when the Secretary determines that human-based training methods will not provide an educationally equivalent or superior substitute for live animal-based training methods. Requires an annual report from the Secretary to the congressional defense committees on the development and implementation of the human-based training methods, as well as any exceptions implemented.
Title
Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5262) |
Same As/Similar To
HB403 (Related) 2011-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB1417 (Related) 2011-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB1417 (Related) 2011-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Medical education
Military education and training
Military medicine
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Medical education
Military education and training
Military medicine
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/3418/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s3418/BILLS-112s3418is.pdf |