US HB403 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act or BEST Practices Act - Requires the Secretary of Defense (DOD), no later than October 1, 2014, to only use human-based training methods for training members of the Armed Forces in the treatment of combat trauma injuries and the management of chemical and biological casualties. Prohibits the use of animals in such training.
Title
Battlefield Excellence through Superior Training Practices Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1417 (Related) 2011-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
SB3418 (Related) 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB3418 (Related) 2012-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Armed forces and national security
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Medical education
Military education and training
Military medicine
Armed forces and national security
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Medical education
Military education and training
Military medicine
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/403/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr403/BILLS-112hr403ih.pdf |