US SB3406 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-11-12 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A bill to amend the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009 to make a technical correction to the Navajo Nation Water Resources Development Trust Fund, to amend the Claims Resolution Act of 2010 to make technical corrections to the Taos Pueblo Water Development Fund and Aamodt Settlement Pueblos' Fund, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical Corrections to the Northwestern New Mexico Rural Water Projects Act, Taos Pueblo Indian Water Rights Settlement Act, and Aamodt Litigation Settlement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-11-12SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
2024-11-12SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 118-241.
2024-07-25SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2024-07-10SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held.
2023-12-05SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB6599 (Same As) 2024-07-23 - Subcommittee Hearings Held

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback