US SB3377 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to empower the Chief of the United States Capitol Police to unilaterally request the assistance of the DC National Guard or Federal law enforcement agencies in emergencies without prior approval of the Capitol Police Board.
Title
Capitol Police Emergency Assistance Act of 2021
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D-CA] |
Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 117-77. |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2021-12-17 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2021-12-14 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-12-14 | House | On passage Passed without objection. |
2021-12-14 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7803-7804) |
2021-12-14 | House | Ms. Lofgren asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider. |
2021-12-14 | House | Held at the desk. |
2021-12-14 | House | Received in the House. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9125-9126; text: CR S9125-9126) |
Same As/Similar To
SB2312 (Related) 2021-07-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Appropriations.