US SB3317 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Haiti Empowerment, Assistance, and Rebuilding Act of 2010 - (Sec. 4) States that it is U.S. policy, in partnership with the government of Haiti and in coordination with the international community, to: (1) support the sustainable recovery and rebuilding of Haiti; (2) build a long-term partnership with Haiti; (3) support the institutional development and capacity building of the government of Haiti and Haitian civil society organizations; and (4) promote development and rebuilding led by of all levels of Haitian government. (Sec. 5) Establishes within the Department of State a Senior Coordinator of the United States Government for Haiti who shall advise and coordinate all U.S. government policies related to Haiti during the five-year period beginning on the date of the enactment of this Act. (Sec. 6) Directs the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development (USAID), with input provided by the Coordinator, to submit to Congress a multi-year strategy to provide assistance in support of Haiti's reconstruction. Sets forth reporting requirements. (Sec. 7) Authorizes FY2010-FY2011 appropriations to carry out the policy objectives and other purposes of this Act. States that amounts made available to carry this Act for: (1) economic assistance shall be provided in accordance with specified provisions of the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961; and (2) assistance to security forces shall be subject to the applicable requirements under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 and the Arms Export Control Act. Authorizes from fiscal year appropriations: (1) the Department of the Treasury (DOT) to contribute to a multi-donor Haitian trust fund for reconstruction and recovery, subject to the regular notification procedures of the appropriate congressional committees; and (2) transfers to the USAID development credit authority account for direct loans and loan guarantees. Encourages the President to utilize appropriate Haitian firms and community and local nongovernmental organizations. Authorizes a fiscal year set-aside for the Inspectors General of the Department of State, USAID, and other relevant agencies for audits and program reviews.
Title
Haiti Empowerment, Assistance, and Rebuilding Act of 2010
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Bob Corker [R-TN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] |
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-19 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468. | |
2010-07-19 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 111-225. | |
2010-05-25 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. | |
2010-05-19 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Hearings held. | |
2010-05-05 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6021 (Same As) 2010-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Caribbean area
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Disaster relief and insurance
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Haiti
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Latin America
Natural disasters
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Women's health
World health
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Disaster relief and insurance
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Haiti
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Latin America
Natural disasters
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Women's health
World health