US SB3309 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 716.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DHS Cyber Incident Response Teams Act of 2018 This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security's (DHS's) national cybersecurity and communications integration center to maintain cyber hunt and incident response teams to provide, upon request, assistance including: (1) assisting asset owners and operators in restoring services following a cyber incident; (2) identifying cybersecurity risk and unauthorized cyber activity; and (3) mitigation strategies to prevent, deter, and protect against cybersecurity risks. DHS may include private sector cybersecurity specialists on such teams, and must continually assess and evaluate the teams and their operations and report specified metrics to Congress. No additional funds are authorized to carry out this bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS Cyber Incident Response Teams Act of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 716.
2018-12-04SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-412.
2018-09-26SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2018-07-31SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB5074 (Related) 2018-03-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback